Financial history BEFORE THE THRONE CHURCH

Charity number: 1146439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £148.97k £166.45k £138.67k £123.91k £136.98k
Total expenditure £140.17k £166.10k £134.95k £113.97k £126.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A