BEFORE THE THRONE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
- ACFAG (Working name)
- APOSTOLIC CHURCH FIRE AND GLORY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IVO GLEIDSON RODRIGUES PRAXEDES | Trustee | 13 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
VANILDA CASSIMIRO DA SILVA SOUSA | Trustee | 12 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
LUIS RAMOS MAGALHAES | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR ORLANDO SOARES | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
SILVIO DO AMARAL | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.97k | £166.45k | £138.67k | £123.91k | £136.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.17k | £166.10k | £134.95k | £113.97k | £126.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/02/2012 as amended on 01 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH[IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 17 ROTHESAY COURT
HARLEYFORD STREET
LONDON
SE11 5SU
- Phone:
- 07584652628
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window