Financial history THE MOSAIC FEDERATION

Charity number: 1147628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £13.34k £1.00k £0 £0 £10.31k
Total expenditure £39.96k £3.25k £140 £60 £10.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A