DANIELS DEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of parent and toddler groups in the London Boroughs of Barnet, Brent, Ealing and Kensington and Chelsea.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Brent
- Ealing
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 09 May 2012: Standard registration
- DANIELS DEN LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Judith Lesley Abbott | Chair | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nuerki Gomez | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zsofia Reka Imre | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazish Fowad Abdullah | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Trevor Goddard | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Yvonne Smith | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Winterburn | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.83k | £94.70k | £141.56k | £182.12k | £196.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.27k | £112.56k | £128.78k | £131.47k | £166.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 28 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UP TO AND INCLUDING ELEVEN YEARS OF AGE, BUT PRIMARILY THOSE UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, BYT ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, DISABILITY OR MEANS (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) ENHANCING THE DEVELOPMENT OF FAMILY LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES. THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE UNDERTAKEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES WHILST RECOGNISING THE DIVERSITY OF A MULTI-FAITH SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Berkhamsted Avenue
Wembley
HA9 6DT
- Phone:
- 02089086986
- Email:
- info@danielsden.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window