PRIESTLEY EDUCATION & TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising through links with staff, students and parents of students at Priestley College
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Warrington
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
- 09 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW WILLIAM GRANT | Chair | 20 June 2012 |
|
|||||
James Gresty | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Yates | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Leo McMellon | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE CONTOS | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DAWN MCCANN B.SC | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.68k | £10.53k | £5.84k | £3.56k | £3.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.34k | £3.72k | £6.05k | £5.87k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE APPLICATION OF THE INCOME AND WHERE APPROPRIATE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY: 1.PRIMARILY TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF LEARNERS ATTENDING PRIESTLEY COLLEGE, WARRINGTON (THE "COLLEGE") AND/OR RECENT ALUMNI (LEARNERS WHO HAVE LEFT THE COLLEGE RECENTLY), TO ENCOURAGE, ASSIST AND ENABLE THEM IN THEIR EDUCATIONAL AIMS AND OBJECTIVES (INCLUDING THOSE IN RELATION TO ONWARD PROGRESSION), BY AWARDING GRANTS, DONATIONS AND OTHER PAYMENTS, WHETHER IN CASH OR IN KIND. 2.SECONDLY TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PRIESTLEY COLLEGE IN SUCH MANNER AS WILL ENABLE THE COLLEGE TO CONTINUE AND/OR IMPROVE THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Priestley College
Loushers Lane
Warrington
WA4 6RD
- Phone:
- 01925633591
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window