PREPARED4ENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prepared4ENT organised, administers and runs educational activities (Practical Courses and National Selection Interview Preparation Courses) in the field of medicine, in particular Otolaryngology We Contribute to training junior medical trainees, nursing staff and allied health professionals in the specialty of Ear Nose and Throat Surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIK VEER | Chair | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anja Lieder | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DR NAVEED KARA MBBS, MRCS | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.68k | £0 | £1.60k | £5.00k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £0 | £360 | £2.00k | £460 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUG 2011 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY: 1.THE ORGANISATION, ADMINISTRATION AND RUNNING OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE FIELD OF MEDICINE, IN PARTICULAR OTOLARYNGOLOGY. 2.PROMOTING CLINICAL EXCELLENCE AND THE HIGHEST STANDARD OF MEDICAL CARE. 3.CONTRIBUTING TO TRAINING JUNIOR MEDICAL TRAINEES, NURSING STAFF AND ALLIED HEALTH PROFESSIONALS IN THE SPECIALTY OF EAR NOSE AND THROAT SURGERY. 4.PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING PUBLICATION TO AID CLINICAL EXCELLENCE AND KNOWLEDGE DISTRIBUTION AMONG HEALTH PROFESSIONALS. 5.THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL CONDITIONS WITHIN THE REMIT OF OTOLARYNGOLOGY. 6.WORKING WITH GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS THAT HELP TO PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Harley Street
LONDON
W1G 9QH
- Phone:
- 0207 458 4584
- Email:
- contact@prepared4ent.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window