Financial history FRIENDS OF SHOREHAM FORT

Charity number: 1147869
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £12.78k £23.14k £2.48k £5.39k £8.71k
Total expenditure £13.92k £24.12k £3.85k £5.78k £7.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A