Financial history STA TRAVEL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1147812
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £6.07k £27.45k £40.46k £42.06k £324
Total expenditure £0 £25.06k £10.77k £22.89k £4.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A