US CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Us Charitable Trust exists to mobilise marginalised young people in London through the development of transferable life skills & cultural & social capital; equipping them with the confidence & freedom to fulfil their dreams & secure a bright & meaningful future. Us provides practical assistance into Universities, apprenticeships & employment, while supporting wellbeing & personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
Governance
- 02 May 2012: Standard registration
- THE HARLESDEN HUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alfred Quartey | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Consuelo Lily Ainley | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Animashaun | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Akeem Graham | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadiyah Ismail | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dillon Donnelly-Trimble | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Howell | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Nyawo | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Endy Mckay | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
SERENA BALFOUR | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.69k | £85.56k | £85.11k | £163.76k | £129.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.94k | £80.05k | £92.51k | £109.66k | £145.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HARLESDEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newman Catholic College
145 Harlesden Road
London
NW10 3RN
- Phone:
- 07415319353
- Email:
- info@uscharitabletrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window