Financial history MIDAYE SOMALI DEVELOPMENT NETWORK

Charity number: 1148304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £493.40k £721.88k £736.46k £855.61k £838.88k
Total expenditure £549.83k £636.59k £625.95k £798.16k £1.03m
Income from government contracts £142.35k £28.00k £28.00k £28.00k £29.40k
Income from government grants £80.53k £222.90k £290.89k £314.96k £339.93k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £745 £63.68k £450 £87.89k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £675 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £721.06k £671.86k £851.86k £742.35k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £72 £247 £3.29k £8.63k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £606.21k £609.41k £780.40k £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £30.38k £16.55k £17.76k £13.28k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.24k £6.05k £6.12k £3.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0