SHROPSHIRE PARENT AND CARER COUNCIL

Charity number: 1150180
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Charity are to relieve the needs of children with disabilities and additional needs, their parents, carers and families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £278,622
Total expenditure: £186,838

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PACC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zara Bowden Chair 01 January 2018
None on record
Helen Nickless Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
Lucy Smith Trustee 11 December 2023
ENGLISH FEDERATION OF DISABILITY SPORT
Received: On time
Christine Thomas Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Michael Thomas Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
SARAH THOMAS Trustee 30 May 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £24.10k £23.10k £58.87k £53.94k £278.62k
Total expenditure £18.63k £24.54k £38.59k £57.67k £186.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.20k £20.96k £45.77k £50.34k £278.35k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 September 2024 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 September 2024 226 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 June 2023 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 June 2023 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2022 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 September 2022 240 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CRAB TREE COTTAGE
DUNNS HEATH
BERWICK
SHREWSBURY
SY4 3HY
Phone:
01939290855