BUILD CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Build Charity Limited exists to provide relief to adults with learning and/or other disabilities, and to their families, dependents and carers. The charity will raise awareness within society of the needs and abilities of people with disabilities. The charity provides activities for an active and positive community life for adults with learning and/or other disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 23 May 2012: Standard registration
- 13 February 2013: Funds received from 264584 BUILD
- BUILD CHARITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Taylor | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Mindham | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Tapp | Trustee | 13 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tully | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Williams | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Harrison | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Liam Davison | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.84k | £86.38k | £133.06k | £146.33k | £144.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.09k | £115.07k | £123.39k | £151.80k | £153.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.33k | £39.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND/OR OTHER DISABILITIES, THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDENTS AND CARERS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING SERVICES, LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; B) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS AND ABILITIES OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES; AND C) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR AN ACTIVE AND POSITIVE COMMUNITY LIFE FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground floor
Build Charity Ltd
12 Bank Street
NORWICH
- Phone:
- 01603618029
- Email:
- finance@buildcharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window