GURU NANAK SINGH SABHA SIKH TEMPLE (GURDWARA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the sikh religion in the Dudley area and the surrounding neighbourhood ("The Community")
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dudley
Governance
- 19 June 1974: Standard registration
- GNSS (Working name)
- GURU NANAK SINGH SABHA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jasbir Singh | Chair | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Parkash Kaur Bains | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bakhtawar Singh Sandhar | Trustee | 12 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
Sarwan Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 12 September 1996 |
|
|
||||
Darshan Singh Atwal | Trustee | 12 September 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.95k | £53.19k | £97.45k | £130.57k | £129.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.65k | £46.38k | £63.28k | £86.99k | £88.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.81k | £13.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 288 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/07/1973 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/1986 AS AMENDED ON 13/11/1988 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 27/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN DUDLEY AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD ("THE COMMUNITY").
Area of benefit
DUDLEY AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 WELLINGTON ROAD
DUDLEY
DY1 1UB
- Phone:
- 01384253054
- Email:
- gnssdudley27@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window