Financial history LIVERPOOL GANESH TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1147647
Charity reporting is overdue by 499 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023
Total gross income £65.44k £102.70k £51.34k £86.22k £85.13k
Total expenditure £76.31k £95.69k £45.88k £50.08k £80.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A