Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WARTON

Charity Number: 1146393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £203.99k £91.29k £80.02k £96.66k £92.20k
Total expenditure £231.77k £106.30k £80.62k £92.30k £99.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.72k N/A N/A N/A £500