Financial history BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR SEXUAL HEALTH AND HIV

Charity number: 1148196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £510.56k £479.51k £714.15k £755.98k £841.09k
Total expenditure £495.26k £476.56k £647.11k £758.10k £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £163 N/A £7 £1 £5.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £459.23k N/A £683.56k £701.01k £791.15k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £51.17k N/A £30.58k £54.96k £44.94k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £495.26k N/A £647.11k £758.10k £1.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £43
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £30.41k £0 £10.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £43
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £39.35k