HEBRON CHURCH TRUST (WARRINGTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carries out a number of activities to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement of Beliefs in such ways and in such parts of Warrington and the surrounding areas as the Trustees from time to time may think fit. This involves reaching and benefiting people of different ages and social backgrounds and providing material and spiritual support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 22 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CULLETON | Chair | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
David Atkinson | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Jason Anderton | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Cartledge | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Callister | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leland Jennings | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WHITCHER | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LAWRINSON | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ALDERSLEY | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
COLIN LANCASHIRE | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.03k | £33.37k | £33.87k | £39.65k | £39.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.43k | £32.47k | £32.57k | £40.79k | £28.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
3.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; 3.2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.2.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 COSSACK AVENUE
WARRINGTON
WA2 9PB
- Phone:
- 01925790107
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window