Financial history DEAN COURT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1146730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.27k £51.97k £106.15k £33.03k £39.64k
Total expenditure £43.41k £37.42k £39.94k £42.08k £41.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.78k £8.00k £6.47k N/A