PARENTS OF CHILDREN WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PCAN is an independent, parent led forum for all parents and carers of children and young people aged from birth to 25 years with additional needs. It provides information on services, activities and support; provides opportunities for parents to network with each other; works to develop and maintain consultation between service providers and parent carers regarding current and future services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,403 from 1 government contract(s) and £17,286 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 May 2012: Standard registration
- PCAN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOLOUEBI SOLOMON | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Claire Osborne | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patterson-Brown | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Thomas | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Johanna Hull | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.46k | £59.90k | £49.04k | £46.69k | £50.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.45k | £37.91k | £33.35k | £31.50k | £40.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | £40.80k | £30.60k | £26.59k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £18.59k | £17.49k | £17.23k | £17.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUN 2011 as amended on 15 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF KIRKLEES, AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, CHILDREN UNDER 25 YEARS OLD WITH LEARNING PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITIES, OR WHO HAVE BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THEIR PARENTS AND/OR OTHERS WHO ARE RESPONSIBLE FOR PROVIDING THEIR CARE AND/OR SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF KIRKLESS AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 COMMERCIAL STREET
SLAITHWAITE
HUDDERSFIELD
HD7 5JZ
- Phone:
- 07754102336
- Email:
- info@pcankirklees.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window