WESTERN SUSSEX RIVERS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Western Sussex Rivers Trust (WSRT) is dedicated to the environmental protection and enhancement of the Western Rother, the Arun and Western Streams including their tributaries. WSRT works with local people & communities, farmers, landowners and the statutory bodies to conserve and improve local rivers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £68,887 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 May 2012: Standard registration
- ARRT (Working name)
- THE ARUN & ROTHER RIVERS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLIE BAKER LVO | Chair | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sian MacLeod | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stewart Cross | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cooper | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GREEN | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVE BROWN | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
TONY WHITBREAD | Trustee | 30 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.59k | £204.14k | £198.66k | £398.35k | £284.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.67k | £144.43k | £174.07k | £158.25k | £254.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £86.01k | £61.18k | £156.05k | £66.14k | £68.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2024 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 SEP 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO CONSERVE, PROTECT, RESTORE AND IMPROVE THE RIVERS, STREAMS AND OTHER WATERBODIES OF THE ARUN AND WESTERN ROTHER CATCHMENTS AND OTHER RIVERS AND TRIBUTARIES IN SUSSEX AND ELSEWHERE IN THE ENVIRONMENT AGENCY'S SOUTH EAST REGION AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, OR ANY ASSOCIATION, INSTITUTION, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION, COMPANY, LOCAL AUTHORITY, ADMINISTRATIVE OR GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY OR PUBLIC BODY OR REPRESENTATIVE BODY IN: (A) THE UNDERSTANDING OF RIVERS, RIVER CORRIDORS AND RIVER CATCHMENTS, INCLUDING THEIR FAUNA, FLORA, BIODIVERSITY, ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL ACTIVITY AND RIVER CATCHMENT B) THE NEED FOR, AND BENEFITS OF, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, REHABILITATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF AQUATIC ENVIRONMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Walnut Tree Yard
Lower Street
Fittlewoth
RH20 1JE
- Phone:
- 01798 869899
- Email:
- info@wsrt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window