Financial history ROTHERHAM PARENTS FORUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1147969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £177.55k £294.85k £564.26k £513.02k £629.82k
Total expenditure £202.03k £248.72k £407.13k £538.35k £550.63k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £33.33k £289.56k £295.03k £337.79k
Income from government grants £45.00k £61.18k £188.83k £70.74k £209.73k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £3.45k £4.18k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £560.82k £508.84k £629.82k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £403.15k £533.66k £545.52k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £3.98k £4.69k £5.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £1.65k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0