Accounts and annual returns THE DOUAY MARTYRS SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1147090
Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Annual return 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 681 days
Annual return 01 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1046 days
Annual return 01 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1411 days
Annual return 01 September 2019 21 March 2021 263 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 Not Required