FareShare Midlands

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FareShare Midlands (formerly FareShare Leicester) was formed on 1st July, 2008, as a project of the Diocese of Leicester and a franchise of the national charity FareShare. FareShare takes good quality surplus food from the food industry that is supplied to community organisations for those in need, rather than being disposed of.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,305,410
Donations and legacies | £150.06k | |
Charitable activities | £3.12m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £29.75k | |
Other | £899 |
Total expenditure:
£3,533,221
Raising funds | £352.95k | |
Charitable activities | £3.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £156,123 from 2 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £352.95k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.18m |
People

71 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
1542 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 April 2012: Standard registration
- FARESHARE LEICESTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Craig | Chair | 17 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Charlotte McClelland | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lawson | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kulbir Chatrik | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Hughes | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sisson | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mike Court | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lunnon | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Sabrina Ffrench | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bachelard Kaze Yemtsa | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carri Swann | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77m | £2.99m | £3.05m | £3.60m | £3.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87m | £2.58m | £3.16m | £3.99m | £3.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.08m | N/A | £67.51k | £116.97k | £156.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £132.78k | £62.98k | £108.72k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £89.80k | £239.07k | £262.04k | £179.54k | £150.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.68m | £0 | £2.79m | £3.41m | £3.12m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £37 | £72 | £1.38k | £16.75k | £29.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £2.75m | £1.67k | £0 | £899 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.82m | £2.47m | £3.00m | £3.68m | £3.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £56.71k | £102.98k | £165.92k | £313.57k | £352.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £57.18k | £55.73k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £85.73k | £294.37k | £374.64k | £341.79k | £231.34k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.29m | £2.32m | £2.36m | £2.35m | £2.45m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £320.96k | £1.15m | £1.38m | £1.73m | £1.94m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 MAY 2018 as amended on 13 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
A)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND NUTRITION IN ENGLAND BY REDISTRIBUTING SURPLUS PRODUCE (IN PARTICULAR FOOD) TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO MEET THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS IN SOCIAL, ECONOMIC, HEALTH-RELATED OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS, AND THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN. B) THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT THROUGH THE REDUCTION OF WASTE (IN PARTICULAR FOOD WASTE). C) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK AND SUPPORT. D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
FareShare Midlands
10 Wilson Road
WIGSTON
Leicestershire
LE18 4TP
- Phone:
- 01162867735
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window