BROOMWOOD AFRICAN EDUCATION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objective is to raise money in the UK to build a school (St. George's) in Azezo, Ethiopia. Going forward the objective is to continue building work in phases and, as a secondary objective, to finance the running costs of the school. St. George's is intended to be a non fee-paying school and will provide education to orphans and disadvantaged children below the poverty line.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 23 March 2012: Standard registration
- 05 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 05 March 2020: Funds transferred to 1153346 NORTHWOOD AFRICAN EDUCATION FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/09/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.53k | £48.56k | £1.02k | £600 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.84k | £145.18k | £3.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 30 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF THE FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF ETHIOPIA BY PROVIDING FUNDING FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT BROOMWOOD SCHOOL, GONDAR, ETHIOPIA OR PROVIDING FUNDING TO ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL FACILITY IN AFRICA AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME ELECT TO SO TO DO.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window