Financial history TAPE COMMUNITY MUSIC AND FILM

Charity number: 1151513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £307.83k £402.56k £394.22k £379.75k £379.27k
Total expenditure £274.74k £348.60k £368.29k £367.60k £420.34k
Income from government contracts £37.55k £124.81k £93.64k £28.82k £12.87k
Income from government grants £37.17k £92.28k £66.07k £30.24k £4.58k