GEFC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity holds weekly meetings to hear speakers and contemplate all aspects of the Christian Faith. Gifts are made to assist in natural disasters and needy causes throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- India
- Slovakia
Governance
- 29 March 2012: Standard registration
- 24 October 2013: Funds received from 501735 GATESHEAD EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN BEELEY | Chair | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
John David Summers Morgan | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|||||
DONALD WATT SINCLAIR | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr MORRIS GALLAGHER | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.13k | £45.95k | £54.31k | £57.15k | £55.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.42k | £47.25k | £49.26k | £50.83k | £40.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- (1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN TYNE AND WEAR AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (2) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Glendale Gardens
Gateshead
NE9 5SA
- Phone:
- 01914219704
- Email:
- beeley47@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window