KAINE MANAGEMENT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kaine Management run their charitable activities under 3 main headings: - Arts - developing community choirs, hosting events and participating in local and national arts activities and festivals. Community - developing activities that empower and engage community members(youth groups/projects with the elderly) Education - Running mentoring programmes and workshops in school/community settings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,650 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
Governance
- 24 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Amoako-Acheampong | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Safiya Paul | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jarram | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rose Rock | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY SMITH | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAXINE CHAMBERS | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.84k | £85.38k | £100.36k | £59.76k | £80.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.76k | £62.16k | £87.97k | £67.94k | £82.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.50k | £18.94k | £21.05k | £6.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY A) PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING MUSIC AND CREATIVE ARTS PROJECTS WHICH FOSTER INTEGRATION AND SKILLS SHARING BETWEEN PEOPLES FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; B) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT DIFFERENT PEOPLES AND CULTURES, ESPECIALLY THROUGH MUSIC AND ARTS, TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 3. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE IN LEICESTER BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
STUDIO 202
LCB DEPOT
31 RUTLAND STREET
LEICESTER
LE1 1RE
- Phone:
- 01162616840
- Email:
- info@Kainemanagement.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window