RUMNEY GOSPEL CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The members of Rumney Chapel seek to be salt and light in our community and run many different groups, meetings, activities and events throughout the week. The whole church is encouraged to meet on a Sunday morning. We run a toddler group, Kidz Klub, Youth Club and Messy Church regularly as well as many more informal meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,036 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 25 April 2012: Standard registration
- RUMNEY CHAPEL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JAMES THOMAS | Chair | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Alicia Goode | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL THOMAS CARR | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ROUTLEDGE | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.39k | £24.82k | £37.40k | £76.93k | £110.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.02k | £27.67k | £22.12k | £70.66k | £121.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/03/2012
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC:- 2.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 2.2.2 TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUMNEY GOSPEL CHAPEL
BRACHDY ROAD
RUMNEY
CARDIFF
CF3 3BG
- Phone:
- 02920250998
- Email:
- hello@rumneychapel.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window