Financial history FLORENCE STREET MISSION HALL

Charity number: 1146598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.63k £7.74k £8.34k £8.77k £8.15k
Total expenditure £15.13k £8.37k £6.40k £7.77k £9.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A