BARNETT WOOD PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Pre-School education for children form 2 1/2 to 5 years old in the Ashtead area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £227,607 from 1 government contract(s) and £28,129 from 43 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 March 2012: Standard registration
- 17 January 2013: Funds received from 1026375 BARNETT WOOD PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SUE LEYLAND CERTIFICATE OF EDUCATION | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK LYNDON TILEY | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR JANET DEIGHTON | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £214.06k | £247.12k | £270.00k | £295.14k | £363.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.03k | £214.69k | £259.86k | £281.70k | £337.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £145.07k | £150.58k | £156.28k | £137.35k | £227.61k | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.59k | £7.35k | £25.81k | £25.12k | £28.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: -OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION, AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PAENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY -ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS -INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS & OBJECTIVES OF THE PRE SCHOOL ALLIANCE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnett Wood Pre-School
213 Barnett Wood Lane
Ashtead
Surrey
KT21 2DF
- Phone:
- 01372279584
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window