PRIMARY LATIN PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the teaching and learning of Latin to primary school teachers and children. Hosting training days and paying grants to support Greek and Latin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 2012: Standard registration
- 19 April 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1135379 CLASSICS FOR ALL
- MINIMUS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.97k | £4.99k | £6.68k | £4.96k | £5.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.99k | £5.45k | £7.38k | £9.06k | £6.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 July 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 June 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 August 2020 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/04/2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE PRIMARY LATIN PROJECT SHALL BE TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF LATIN PARTICULARLY AT PRIMARY SCHOOL LEVEL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window