PMA SPORTS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PMA was foundered by ex footballer, occupational therapist. PMA is one of the leading sports servcies in the UK that provides sports leagues, clubs to aid mental health recovery. Providing members choice in addressing their Physical, educational, social needs. Reducing the need for dependency on health servcies and more on self and re-engaging in the community by gaining employment or education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Total income includes £4,707 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 May 2012: Standard registration
- 18 October 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- PMI SPORTS CHARITY (Previous name)
- POSITIVE MENTAL ATTITUDES SPORTS FOUNDATION TRUST COMMUNITY INTEREST COMPANY (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.97k | £40.15k | £36.70k | £14.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.95k | £46.94k | £35.35k | £39.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £19.14k | £4.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 28 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 25 November 2016 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 25 November 2016 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 31 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 31 July 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (I)ENGAGING PATIENTS IN TEAM SPORTS TO COMBAT EXCLUSION AND ISOLATION (II)DEVELOPING A “POSITIVE MENTAL ATTITUDE” AMONGST PARTICIPANTS IN TEAM SPORTS HELPING THEM TO OVERCOME ISSUES OF LOW SELF ESTEEM AND SELF WORTH (III)BRIDGING THE GAP BETWEEN THE CLOSELY MONITORED HOSPITAL SETTING AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE (IV)PROVIDING REGULAR MENTORING TO HELP THEM ACQUIRE LIFE SKILLS WITH THE AIM OF SECURING MEANINGFUL EMPLOYMENT OR TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENABLE RE-INTEGRATION BACK INTO THE COMMUNITY (V)RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES FACED BY THOSE WITH MENTAL ILLNESS AND ENCOURAGING THOSE UNDIAGNOSED PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES TO SEEK HELP AT AN EARLY STAGE IN THE DISEASE PROGRESSION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window