SUFFOLK PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Employing the finest professional musicians, we make great music accessible to people who might not otherwise hear it because of rural isolation, being less mobile, feeling unsure about entering a concert hall, or finding tickets too expensive. Community Concerts, with lunch or tea and transport all free, are welcomed in their own right, and also serve as a taster for our full orchestral concerts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 July 2012: Standard registration
- 18 December 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 December 2024: Funds transferred to 1202492 SUFFOLK PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.38k | £33.00k | £41.36k | £133.23k | £111.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.50k | £9.35k | £16.22k | £161.56k | £111.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 05 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 JAN 2012
Charitable objects
1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND 2)THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC BY: A)THE PROMOTION OR PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, RECITALS, FESTIVALS AND OTHER PUBLIC EVENTS IN WHICH MUSIC IS PERFORMED BY AN ORCHESTRA TO BE KNOWN AS THE SUFFOLK PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA AND BY SUCH MUSICIANS AND ENSEMBLES OF MUSICIANS AS THE TRUSTEES THROUGH THE ARTISTIC DIRECTOR SHALL DETERMINE; B)THE PROVISION OF PROGRAMMES OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN MUSIC DESIGNED TO FURTHER UNDERSTANDING AND ENJOYMENT OF MUSIC AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF MUSICAL SKILLS; C)THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, LESSONS, SEMINARS AND WORKSHOPS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES OF A DIDACTIC NATURE INTENDED TO ENHANCE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF MUSIC; D)THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MUSICAL COMPOSITION; E)THE PROMOTION OF WRITING IN BOOKS, JOURNALS, NEWSPAPERS, ELECTRONIC MEDIA AND IN ANY MEDIUM WHATSOEVER ON OR ABOUT SUBJECTS CONCERNED WITH MUSIC; F)THE MAKING OF ELECTRONIC AND OTHER RECORDINGS; G)CONTRIBUTING TO OR MAKING RADIO OR TELEVISION PROGRAMMES OR OF AUDIO OR VISUAL MATERIALS INTENDED FOR ELECTRONIC DISSEMINATION; H)THE PROMOTION OF HIGH QUALITY MUSIC EVENTS IN GENERAL; I)THE ENRICHMENT AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH MUSIC; J)THE FOSTERING AND UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO ANY ASPECT OF MUSIC AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; K)SUCH OTHER MEANS, BEING OF PUBLIC INTEREST, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE SUFFOLK, CAMBRIDGESHIRE, NORFOLK AND ESSEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window