BELAZU FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with communities in UK and around the Mediterranean, promoting education and healthy eating to inspire future generations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Oxfordshire
- Morocco
Governance
- 05 September 2012: Standard registration
- BELAZU (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Henson | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Jackson Food Group | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Fresh Olive Company LTD | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADAM WELLS | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.13k | £131.54k | £96.18k | £61.43k | £84.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.60k | £140.83k | £68.49k | £95.64k | £101.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 June 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 LONG DRIVE
GREENFORD
MIDDLESEX
UB6 8LZ
- Phone:
- 02088381912
- Email:
- foundation@belazu.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window