Financial history EL-GIBBOR WORSHIP CITY

Charity Number: 1147689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.92k £47.30k £53.35k £17.12k £45.78k
Total expenditure £18.13k £11.86k £41.21k £26.05k £26.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A