Financial history IBB CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1146654
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.21k £400 £6.42k £300 £25
Total expenditure £15.37k £1.55k £0 £0 £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A