STURFIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stur-fit provides leisure facilities to foster the health and well-being of the people of Sturminster Newton and the surrounding area. Sturminster Newton Lesiure Centre is accessible to all members of this community and wide participation is encouraged. The Centre offers a range of exercise classes, fully equipped gym and is host to many sporting clubs and societies. It is staffed by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 30 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Manson Caie | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Bridger-Chilvers | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Hallam | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Antony Clark | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Courtenay Hitchcock | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.27k | £36.07k | £74.16k | £90.95k | £128.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.21k | £50.12k | £68.39k | £86.58k | £104.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.24k | £3.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAR 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STURMINSTER NEWTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE, OR TO ASSIST IN PROVIDING, AND TO PROMOTE:- (1) PUBLIC FACILITIES, AMENITIES, EQUIPMENT AND SERVICES FOR HEALTHY RECREATION; (2) FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR RECREATIONAL, SPORTING OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES; (3) THE IMPROVEMENT AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELL-BEING THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; (4) EDUCATION, TRAINING AND COACHING COURSES WHICH PROMOTE PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sturminster Newton Leisure Centre
Honeymead Lane
STURMINSTER NEWTON
DT10 1EW
- Phone:
- 01258471774
- Email:
- hello@sturfit.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window