Accounts and annual returns THE ALTON WATER RUN

Charity number: 1147145
Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days