SEWA DAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of good citizenship by encouraging and facilitating volunteering in furtherance of charitable purposes for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,230 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 April 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sanjay Vadhera | Trustee | 06 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ASHISH SURENDRA PATEL | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £252.27k | £62.39k | £20.66k | £40.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £385 | £141.63k | £19.59k | £18.03k | £46.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £101.18k | £42.21k | £4.71k | £16.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP BY ENCOURAGING & FACILITATING VOLUNTEERING IN FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
AUSTRALIA , FINLAND , INDIA , INDONESIA , KENYA , NEPAL , NETHERLANDS , NEW ZEALAND , NIGERIA , PAKISTAN , SOUTH AFRICA , UNITED KINGDOM AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ferguson Maidment & Co
8th Floor
167 Fleet Street
LONDON
EC4A 2EA
- Phone:
- 07717364238
- Email:
- info@sewaday.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window