Financial history KEATS COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity Number: 1146702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £90.77k £41.69k £49.04k £93.13k £74.22k
Total expenditure £58.74k £28.05k £22.06k £58.02k £66.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A