ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTH TEESSIDE AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ANIMAL WELFARE,NEUTERING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 02 November 1973: Standard registration
- RSPCA NORTH TEESSIDE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA NORTH TEES AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA NORTH TEESSIDE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah McKeon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lindsay | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.02k | £27.41k | £51.28k | £29.61k | £89.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.55k | £46.37k | £44.93k | £16.31k | £33.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 November 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY OF ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NORTH TEESSIDE AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O RSPCA
Parkside
Chart Way
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH12 1GY
- Phone:
- 0191 2507158
- Email:
- sarah.mason@rspca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window