SMILE AGAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing dental services in the UK and Sierra Leone
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 27 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR GAZ AL-SHAIKH RADI BDS (DENTIST) | Chair | 04 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ZAHRA SALMASI-RADI | Trustee | 04 April 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £9.62k | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.29k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF DENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO THOSE LIVING IN MOROCCO WHERE GENERAL DENTAL SERVICES ARE NOT AVAILABLE DUE TO GEOGRAPHICAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN BY: A) PROVIDING BASIC DENTAL SERVICES; AND B) PROVIDING ORAL HEALTH EDUCATION PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
MOROCCO
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acton Town Dental Practice
140 Bollo Bridge Road
Acton
London
w3 8yf
- Phone:
- 07734083601
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window