Financial history WARRANT OFFICERS' & SERGEANTS' MESS SCHOOL OF ELECTRICAL & MECHANICAL ENGINEERS

Charity number: 1147329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £150.03k £49.17k £55.61k £125.00k £160.70k
Total expenditure £155.47k £52.56k £40.84k £165.93k £169.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A