Financial history GODIVA TRUST

Charity number: 1148481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.15k £2.10k £14.04k £3.89k £15.37k
Total expenditure £4.06k £941 £15.19k £4.02k £4.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A