EQUAL COMMUNITY FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objective of the charity is the prevention and relief of gender based discrimination and violence in particular (but without limitation) to the people of South Asia. The principal activities of the charity are fundraising, grant making, and the development of education and awareness programmes to achieve its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 05 October 2012: Standard registration
- ECF UK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Cook - Lundgren | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Willa Straker Smith | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.35k | £62 | £66 | £92 | £600 | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.91k | £15.86k | £286 | £283 | £263 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 297 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/09/2012 as amended on 26 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF GENDER, SEXUALITY, CASTE, RELIGION, NATIONALITY AND RACE BASED DISCRIMINATION IN SOUTH ASIA (BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES AND/OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE DISCRIMINATION OR BY SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT); (2) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY (3) THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) SPECIFICALLY WITH A VIEW TO ENDING VIOLENCE AGAINST WOMEN, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A. MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS B. RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES C. COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION D. RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES E. PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS F. PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS G. INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS H. ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SOUTH ASIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park House
Blairdrummond
STIRLING
FK9 4UP
- Phone:
- 07756715517
- Email:
- admin@ecf-uk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window