Financial history BOX OF TRICKS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1146483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £173.62k £52.78k £213.43k £179.17k £109.08k
Total expenditure £128.65k £73.79k £222.93k £202.25k £129.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £75.68k £18.35k £77.09k £66.50k N/A