THE HALEY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Causes in England and wales only at discretion of trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR I F PATTISON | Chair | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Claire Holly Kemp | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Lumsden | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR H LUMSDEN | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.98k | £103.66k | £138.04k | £142.03k | £163.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.23k | £147.39k | £131.65k | £144.76k | £259.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dunn Street House
Dunn Street
Westwell
Ashford
TN25 4NJ
- Phone:
- 01233712231
- Email:
- cherrylumsden@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window