WARWICK METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing the Love of Christ to all by: Holding regular acts of worship open to all Providing sacred space for prayer & contemplation Teaching through sermons, courses & small groups Pastoral work including visiting the sick & bereaved Promoting Christianity through events & services Providing senior citizens' lunch & film clubs, meetings & social groups with a Christian ethos open to all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

23 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 02 July 2012: Previously excepted registration
- NORTHGATE METHODIST CHURCH, WARWICK (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sally Ann Jones BMus,PCGE, | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
JANET TYRRELL | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE BROOKE | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Mary Fair | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Shaw | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hayward | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Stephen Timothy Conway | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Iain M Ballard | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Deborah Barr B.E.D. | Trustee | 05 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Witham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Sarson | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Reid | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gael Conway | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH RACHEL JONES B A Hons | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NOLA ANN TOLLEY | Trustee | 05 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN ELLIS | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE JANET FELL BED | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA WEBB | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH OLIVER | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|||||
TREVOR WILLS FCA | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|||||
David James Witham | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|||||
Trevor John Blades | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MARGARET CROSS | Trustee | 12 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.78k | £46.32k | £48.65k | £62.68k | £58.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.59k | £47.84k | £54.29k | £78.08k | £54.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Northgate Methodist Church
Barrack Street
WARWICK
CV34 4TH
- Phone:
- 01926740846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window