AP Cymru

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity directly supports families going through and following their child's Autism diagnosis (and co-morbid conditions)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,050 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 July 2012: Standard registration
- 30 October 2018: Funds received from 1107162 CELEBRATE THE CHILDREN UK
- AP CYMRU (Working name)
- AUTISM PUZZLES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Marie Gately | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Jayne Kearns | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Firth | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Lewis-Champan | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ASHLIE LEWIS | Trustee | 11 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.57k | £231.06k | £56.49k | £94.47k | £152.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.90k | £108.70k | £124.96k | £120.63k | £166.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £47.93k | £6.85k | £29.00k | £16.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
14 April 2025 | 73 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/06/2012 as amended on 01 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PARENTS AND CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT DURING AND FOLLOWING A DIAGNOSIS OF AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER AND RELATED CONDITIONS; AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY RAISING AWARENESS OF AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER AND RELATED CONDITIONS AND TO SHARE INFORMATION ABOUT THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 11
Glan-y-Llyn Industrial Estate
Cardiff Road
Glan-y-Llyn
Taffs Well
CARDIFF
- Phone:
- 02920810786
- Email:
- enquiries@apcymru.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window