AYLESBURY TOWN CHAPLAINCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provides volunteer chaplains to provide a confidential, listening ear in the town centre and within organisations in Aylesbury provides teams of 'street angels' who provide practical assistance during the late night/early hours of the morning in Aylesbury
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 04 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW HENDERSON | Chair | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
David Finn | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Doug Zimmerman | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.21k | £21.47k | £22.00k | £32.24k | £26.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.61k | £17.27k | £13.33k | £22.64k | £36.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 SEP 2011
Charitable objects
TO BRING THE CHRISTIAN MINISTRY TO PEOPLE LIVING, VISITING AND/OR WORKING IN THE CENTRE OF AYLESBURY IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BY THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED BY, THE FORMATION OF A CHAPLAINCY SERVICE. THE RELIEF OF NEED AND PROVISION OF GOOD HEALTH IN AYLESBURY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
IN THE CENTRE OF AYLESBURY IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O HOLY TRINITY PARISH OFFICE
WALTON STREET
AYLESBURY
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
HP21 7QX
- Phone:
- 01296398110
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window